Tham v. Adducci et al

Petitioner: Etty Tham
Respondent: Christopher Brackett, Rebecca Adducci and Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Undetermined: John A. Hawkinson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00674
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Tham on 09/25/2018 filed by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hahn, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for Tham on 09/25/2018 filed by Etty Tham. Follow up on Objection on 10/9/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hahn, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Refiling by Etty Tham.(Hahn, William)
September 11, 2018 HEARING NOTICE re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss ORAL ARGUMENT on Motion - Hearing set for 10/18/2018 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #46 Motion to Dismiss and #56 NOTICE of Intent to Remove. Judge Saris's June 28, 2018 order re removal remains in effect. The parties shall jointly contact the deputy clerk to schedule a hearing on respondent's motion to dismiss to be held on or before October 18, 2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add doc #56 and 6/28/18 Order text (jb).
September 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/10/2018. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: William Hahn, Esq.) (Defts Atty: Catherine Reno, AUSA, Robert Rabuck, AUSA)(Total Hearing Time: 45 minutes) (cmp)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2018 at 11:45 AM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(cmp)
September 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #56 Notice. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 7, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #56 Notice (Other) filed by Etty Tham. (Hahn, William)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #40 Motion OF JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 7, 2018 Filing 57 SURREPLY to Reply to #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hahn, William)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER VACATING Order on Motion for JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS. Text of Order: The 9/5/18 ORDER granting #40 Motion for JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS is HEREBY VACATED. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 7, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Intent to Remove by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Assistant Field Office Director Alan Greenbaum)(Reno, Catherine)
September 6, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. Surreply due by 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) September 6, 2018 Declaration of Alan Greenbaum, #2 Exhibit Decision to Continue Detention)(Reno, Catherine)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion for JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS ; granting #41 Motion FOR AN ORDER TO PERMIT REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FRCP 5.2(c) ("OPEN THE DOCKET"). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #39 Motion for John Hawkinson to Intervene. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 Motion to Excuse. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Thomas Kanwit, Esq., AUSA as to Rebecca Adducci, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent.(cmp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #39 Assented to MOTION to Intervene filed by John A. Hawkinson. Surreply due by 9/10/2018. (cmp)
August 31, 2018 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Etty Tham. Follow up on Reply on 9/7/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Hahn, William)
August 31, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Etty Tham. (Hahn, William)
August 31, 2018 Filing 50 Assented to MOTION to Excuse Jonathan Cohen, Esq. filed by Etty Tham.(Hahn, William)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Reply to #42 Response, #44 Response. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/5/2018.(jb)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted in part on the condition that William A. Hahn complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court to be taken up upon request on a case by case basis. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/7/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
August 27, 2018 ORAL NOTICE of Assent to [#49] Motion for William A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(jb)
August 27, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #49 MOTION for William A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Etty Tham. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 49. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.Compliance Deadline set for 8/30/2018.(jb)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #49 MOTION for William A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Etty Tham. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.(jb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for William A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1701922.) filed by Etty Tham. Attorney Jonathan Cohen added to party Etty Tham(pty:pet). Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 affidavit)(Cohen, Jonathan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent re: #44 Response to Motion (Reno, Catherine)
August 14, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss (Reno, Catherine)
August 13, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. Follow up on Objection on 8/27/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Declaration of Alan Greenbaum)(Reno, Catherine)
August 10, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to #42 Response, #44 Response filed by John A. Hawkinson. Follow up on Objection on 8/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply)(cmp)
August 9, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 Assented to MOTION to Intervene filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 30, 2018, email)(Reno, Catherine)
August 8, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Dona Feeney on behalf of Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent(Feeney, Dona)
August 7, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE re Order,, filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. (Rabuck, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #39 Motion to Intervene, #40 Motion for PRO SE, ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS filed by John A. Hawkinson #41 Motion for FOR AN ORDER TO PERMIT REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS. Text of Order: In an abundance of caution, as the putative intervenor is not a member of the bar of this court and thus is not subject to its professional discipline, the court requires a response from counsel of record for each party, confirming or disputing the assent represented in the motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
August 3, 2018 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION OF JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR AN ORDER TO PERMIT REMOTE ACCESS TO ELECTRONIC COURT FILINGS PURSUANT TO FRCP 5.2(c) ("OPEN THE DOCKET") filed by John A. Hawkinson.(cmp)
August 3, 2018 Filing 40 Assented to MOTION OF JOHN A. HAWKINSON, PRO SE, FOR ECF ELECTRONIC FILING ACCESS filed by John A. Hawkinson.(cmp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2018: #1 Registration Form) (cmp).
August 3, 2018 Filing 39 Assented to MOTION to Intervene filed by John A. Hawkinson.(cmp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #6 Order of Judge Patti B. Saris. Text of Order: To maintain adjudicative continuity in this action, the portion of Chief Judge Saris's order of June 18, 2018 requiring that respondents provide the court with at least 48 hours' advance notice of any scheduled removal of petitioner or scheduled transfer of petitioner from New Hampshire remains in effect. If the parties wish to communicate with the court concerning the status of this litigation, they may jointly contact the deputy clerk to arrange a chambers or telephone conference (based on counsel's preference and convenience). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 3, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine M. Reno on behalf of Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent (Reno, Catherine)
August 3, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Rabuck on behalf of Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent(pty:res).(Rabuck, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Rabuck on behalf of Rebecca Adducci Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party Rebecca Adducci(pty:res).(Rabuck, Robert)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of William A. Hahn, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 9/4/2018.(mc)
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Catherine M. Reno, Esq. and Thomas E. Kanwit, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 9/4/2018.(mc)
July 31, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-674-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 34 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 8/30/2018.(mc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:18-cv-11261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
July 30, 2018 Filing 32 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. " The Court finds that it lacks jurisdiction over Thams habeas petition. In the interest of justice, the Court therefore TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The Court orders that Petitioner Tham not be removed from New Hampshire until the court in New Hampshire has a reasonable opportunity to rule on her motions. " (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 31 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response - Response due by 8/2/18.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 30 Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/2/18 to File Response filed by Etty Tham. (Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/2/18 to File Response by Rebecca Adducci, Christopher Brackett.(Kanwit, Thomas) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Discovery Request for Documents by Etty Tham.(Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum filed by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 26 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to 07/20/2018 to file memorandum MEMORANDUM DUE 7/20/2018 (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/20/2018 to file memorandum by Etty Tham.(Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 24 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Ms. Tham present, Interpreter sworn.Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2018 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rebecca Adducci, Christopher Brackett, #9 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Etty Tham...ORDERED: Atty Hahn will file a brief addressing issues with respect to Revocation proceedings, brief to be filed by 7/18/18; Gvt's reply due on 7/25/18, all matters taken under advisement.(Ausa Kanwit, Atty Hahn) (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 22 Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Etty Tham. (Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Rebecca Adducci, Christopher Brackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kanwit, Thomas) Modified docktet text on 7/10/2018 in accordance with pleading filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss / RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Rebecca Adducci, Christopher Brackett. (Kanwit, Thomas) Modified docket text on 7/10/2018 in accordance with pleading filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint Pursuant to Order of June 18, 2018 by Christopher Brackett.(Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Christopher Brackett (Feeney, Dona) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. Reno on behalf of Rebecca Adducci (Reno, Catherine) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 16 WRIT of Habeas Corpus issued as to Etty Tham re MOTION HEARING SET FOR 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing..... Evidentiary/Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Ms. Tham will be present for the hearing with her interpreter)(Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 14 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: The Court orders that the Government shall produce Petitioner's A-file forthwith. The Court also orders that the Petitioner shall not be removed from the United States until further order of this Court. A hearing shall take place on the petition on July 11, 2018 at 10:00a.m. in Courtroom #19, 7th floor. [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 6/28/2018....Indonesian Interpreter sworn. ORDERED: Gvt shall file a Response by 7/9/18. The Court orders that the Government shall produce Petitioner's A-file forthwith. Deportation of the Petitioner is hereby Stayed, electronic order to issue. Hearing scheduled for 7/11/18 at 10:00am in Courtroom #19,7th floor before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Petitioner remanded back to the custody of ICE, court adjourned.(Ausa Kanwit, Atty Hahn) (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 11 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued for 6/28/18 for Ms. Tham, hearing going forward on Thursday 6/28/18 at 11:00am in courtroom #19, 7th floor before Chief Judge Saris. Copy of habeas sent to USM on 6/27/18. (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum .... Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Clerk will habe in Mr. Tham for the hearing, Atty Hahn will email the clerk immeidately with the Location for Mr. Tham - Name of the Detention Facility and the Alien ID #. (Molloy, Maryellen) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for RELEASE OR BOND Hearing by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hahn, William) Modified docket text on 6/26/2018 in accordance with pleading filed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 8 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Rebecca Adducci (Kanwit, Thomas) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Respondents shall, no later Monday, July 9, 2018, show cause why the Petition should not be granted. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the Districts of Massachusetts or New Hampshire without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. Any such 48-hour notice period shall commence at the date and time such notice is filed and expire 48 hours later, except [i]f the period would end on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, the period continues to run until the same time on the next day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(2)(C). (PSSA, 4) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 5 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, ) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Etty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hahn, William) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST068995 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Vieira, Leonardo) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by William A. Hahn. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 7/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tham v. Adducci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Brackett
Represented By: Catherine M. Reno
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rebecca Adducci
Represented By: Catherine M. Reno
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Represented By: Catherine M. Reno
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Etty Tham
Represented By: William A. Hahn
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: John A. Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?