US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC v. J.T. Cleary, Inc.

Plaintiff: US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC
Defendant: J.T. Cleary, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00675
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ///Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to J.T. Cleary, Inc. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Motions due by 9/27/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Damages Hearing set for 11/5/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to J.T. Cleary, Inc. by US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC. Served/Mailed on 8/13/2018. Answer Follow Up on 9/4/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rubinstein, Kenneth)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to J.T. Cleary, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rubinstein, Kenneth)
August 2, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 31, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by August 7, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 8/7/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
July 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-675-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1692135 filed by US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinstein, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #2 Summons) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC v. J.T. Cleary, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Cleary, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Northeast Dredge and Marine, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Eric Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?