Clark v. Farmington, NH, Town of

Plaintiff: Karen Clark and Karen A. Clark
Defendant: Town of Farmington and Farmington, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2018cv00799
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 1/13/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 1/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving #6 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5-7 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/1/2018. Mediation Follow Up on 7/1/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/1/2019. Discovery deadline 11/1/2019. Discovery Status Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 9/13/2019. (jb)
October 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/12/2018. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Lauren S. Irwin) (Defts Atty: Thomas M. Closson)(Total Hearing Time: 25 minutes) (jb)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for October 12, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Karen A. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Format)(Irwin, Lauren)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/5/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Town of Farmington's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by Farmington, NH, Town of.(Closson, Thomas)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather M. Burns on behalf of Karen A. Clark Attorney Heather M. Burns added to party Karen A. Clark(pty:pla).(Burns, Heather)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2018-cv-272, Strafford County Superior Court(Closson, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Farmington, NH, Town of disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Closson, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-799-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2018-cv-00272 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1704517) filed by Town of Farmington. Answer Follow Up on 9/25/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court complaint, #2 Notice of removal to plaintiff's counsel, #3 Notice of filing of notice of removal to state court clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Closson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Farmington, NH, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A. Clark
Represented By: Lauren S. Irwin
Represented By: Heather M. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Farmington
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington, NH, Town of
Represented By: Thomas M. Closson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?