Shaw v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al

Petitioner: Noel Shaw
Respondent: Paula Mattis, Jeffrey Meyers, Christine Santaniello and NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2018cv00806
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
0 Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
1 Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER: Petitioner's guardian is granted leave until October 11, 2018 to file a motion for appointment of counsel, including as an exhibit a completed copy of Financial Affidavit, containing Lafond's financial information. By November 5, 2018, petitioner must file a statement updating this court regarding the status of Lafond's involuntary admission proceeding as outlined within. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-806-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 6, 2018 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Noel Shaw. (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 14649016853). (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paula Mattis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Santaniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noel Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?