Palmer v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel G Palmer and Daniel G. Palmer
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00814
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/15/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
October 22, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand of Delta Air Lines, Inc. filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
October 22, 2018 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Rae Theodore on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Delta Air Lines, Inc.(pty:dft).(Theodore, Ashley)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to October 22, 2018. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 10/22/2018. (lml)
September 21, 2018 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2018-cv-00501, Merrimack County Superior Court(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
September 20, 2018 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-814-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 11, 2018 3 Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
September 11, 2018 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
September 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack County Superior Court, case number 217-2018-cv-00501 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1708118) filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. Answer Follow Up on 10/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - NOR State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Palmer
Represented By: Charles G. Douglas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle
Represented By: Ashley Rae Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?