Swirka v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Swirka and Elizabeth A. Swirka
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00854
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Elizabeth A. Swirka. Follow up on Objection on 11/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Swirka's Memorandum of Law in Support of her Motion for Reconsideration)(Richards-Stower, Nancy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case,,, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Removal, ECF Doc No. 1)(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
November 16, 2018 Motion terminated: #13 Joint Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company - motion withdrawn see doc. no. #14 . (ko)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion: #13 Joint Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case.(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 WITHDRAWN SEE DOC. NO. #14 Joint Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Removal)(Vanderzanden, Danielle) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add: withdrawn text(ko).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for to Revise November 2, 2018 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Revise November 2, 2018 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF Doc. 10) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 11/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 SURREPLY to Reply to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Danielle Vanderzanden in Support of Surreply, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit)(Vanderzanden, Danielle) Modified on 11/1/2018 to remove duplicative "exhibit" text (ko).
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Elizabeth A. Swirka. Surreply due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Nancy Richards-Stower, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 1 to NR-S Declaration, #3 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment 2 to NR-S Declaration)(Richards-Stower, Nancy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Follow up on Reply on 11/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Danielle Vanderzanden in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Danielle Vanderzanden)(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2018-cv-350, Strafford County Superior Court(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Elizabeth A. Swirka. Follow up on Objection on 10/25/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A 6-1-18 Swirka PC Orders of Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Swirka PC Determination, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Swirka Investigative Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B Burke Cohen Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-1 Attachment to Burke Cohen Declaration: cert. mail, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C 7-31-18 HRC Corrects Swirka v. Liberty Mutual, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D emails/Strafford/Swirka v. Liberty Mutual, #8 Memorandum of Law Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Swirka's Motion to Remand)(Richards-Stower, Nancy)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-854-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(Vanderzanden, Danielle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Vanderzanden, Danielle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Y. Vanderzanden on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Vanderzanden, Danielle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court-Stafford, case number 219-2818-cv-350 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1713304) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 10/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Charge dated 1/19/13, #2 Exhibit B Charge dated 12/17/13, #3 Exhibit C Charge dated 8/4/14, #4 Exhibit D Charge dated 3/25/17, #5 Exhibit E Petition Removal filed Sate Court 9/13/18, #6 Exhibit F Notice Appearance State Court 9/13/18, #7 Exhibit G Notice Removal NH Commission Human Rights, #8 Exhibit H Notice Removal Complainant's Counsel 9/13/18, #9 Exhibit I Proof of filing/receipt dated 9/14/18, #10 Exhibit J Notive of Filing Removal 9/25/18, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vanderzanden, Danielle) Modified on 9/27/2018 to add: Exhibit Descriptions (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swirka v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Swirka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Swirka
Represented By: Nancy Richards-Stower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Danielle Y. Vanderzanden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?