Gorman v. US Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Plaintiff: Joseph Gorman and Joseph Henri Gorman
Defendant: Social Security Administration and US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00889
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Commissioner by Joseph Henri Gorman. Served/Mailed on 10/23/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region I, SSA, #2 Summons Executed on Attorney General of USA, DOJ)(Chermol, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice SSA) (lml)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lml)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Henri Gorman. Follow up on Objection on 10/17/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chermol, David)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: Filer used wrong event. Filer shall refile Attachment #2 to the SSA Complaint (Application for IFP) as a separate motion, using the Motions / Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 10/5/2018.(lml)
October 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-889-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1716018.) filed by Joseph Gorman. Follow up on Objection on 10/16/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Motion for PHV, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cert. of Good Standing)(Grauel, Douglas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Joseph Gorman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application for IFP, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Summons USAG, #5 Proposed Summons USAO, #6 Proposed Summons OGC)(Grauel, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gorman
Represented By: Douglas Allen Grauel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Henri Gorman
Represented By: Douglas Allen Grauel
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?