Duchesne v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner

Plaintiff: Fawn Duchesne
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00904
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner by Fawn Duchesne. Served/Mailed on 11/15/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Tillinghast, D.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice SSA) (lml)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
October 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-904-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Fawn Duchesne. Follow up on Objection on 10/18/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tillinghast, D.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Fawn Duchesne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Tillinghast, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #5 Corrected Complaint) (lml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duchesne v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fawn Duchesne
Represented By: D. Lance Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?