Baker v. Montrone et al
Plaintiff: Scott Baker
Defendant: Bayberry Financial Services Corp, Perspecta Trust LLC, Paul Montrone, Paul Meister, Liberty Lane Service Company, Liberty Lane Service Company LLC, Bayberry Financial Services Corp. and Perspecta Trust, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00913
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 12/3/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 04:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 11/4/2019. JERS Statement due 11/4/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 11/18/2019.(js)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving in part #15 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/5/2019. Discovery deadline 7/31/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 3/7/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 8/1/2019.(js)
November 28, 2018 Deadlines terminated- Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/04/2018 is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (js)
November 23, 2018 Filing 15 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) filed by Scott Baker. (Mikels, Jennifer)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meghan S. Glynn on behalf of Bayberry Financial Services Corp., Liberty Lane Service Company LLC, Paul Meister, Paul Montrone, Perspecta Trust, LLC Attorney Meghan S. Glynn added to party Bayberry Financial Services Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan S. Glynn added to party Liberty Lane Service Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan S. Glynn added to party Paul Meister(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan S. Glynn added to party Paul Montrone(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan S. Glynn added to party Perspecta Trust, LLC(pty:dft).(Glynn, Meghan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terri L. Pastori on behalf of Scott Baker Attorney Terri L. Pastori added to party Scott Baker(pty:pla).(Pastori, Terri)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Jennifer Mikels, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/13/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion for Jennifer Furey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Jennifer B. Furey, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/13/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beth A. Deragon on behalf of Scott Baker(Deragon, Beth)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #11 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer Furey to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #10 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Scott Baker. Documents not text searchable. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). Additionally, Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer Furey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1728223.) filed by Scott Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Deragon, Beth)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1728210.) filed by Scott Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Deragon, Beth)
November 1, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/27/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Bayberry Financial Services Corp., Liberty Lane Service Company LLC, Paul Meister, Paul Montrone, Perspecta Trust, LLC.(Broth, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Liberty Lane Service Company LLC by Scott Baker. Served/Mailed on 10/10/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deragon, Beth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul Meister by Scott Baker. Served/Mailed on 10/10/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deragon, Beth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul Montrone by Scott Baker. Served/Mailed on 10/10/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deragon, Beth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bayberry Financial Services Corp. by Scott Baker. Served/Mailed on 10/10/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deragon, Beth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Perspecta Trust, LLC by Scott Baker. Served/Mailed on 10/10/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deragon, Beth)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Bayberry Financial Services Corp., Liberty Lane Service Company LLC, Paul Meister, Paul Montrone, Perspecta Trust, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-913-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 6, 2018 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Scott Baker submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $400, receipt no. 0102-1718061, re: #2 Complaint - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper. (mc)
October 6, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1718061 filed by Scott Baker.(Deragon, Beth)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1718060 filed by Scott Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit Case Closure Letter)(Deragon, Beth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2018: #4 Summonses) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Montrone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayberry Financial Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perspecta Trust LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Montrone
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Represented By: Meghan S. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Meister
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Represented By: Meghan S. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Lane Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Lane Service Company LLC
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Represented By: Meghan S. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayberry Financial Services Corp.
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Represented By: Meghan S. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perspecta Trust, LLC
Represented By: Mark T. Broth
Represented By: Meghan S. Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Baker
Represented By: Beth A. Deragon
Represented By: Jennifer Mikels
Represented By: Jennifer B. Furey
Represented By: Terri L. Pastori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?