Kelly v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Marie Kelly
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00938
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (lml)
November 2, 2018 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to All Defendants by Marie Kelly(Lown, Bradley)
November 1, 2018 12 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Surreply due by 11/6/2018. (Glass, Andrew)
October 30, 2018 11 Addendum/ to #6 Affidavit of Service, Certified Mail Receipt Wells Fargo Home Mortgage by Marie Kelly. (Lown, Bradley)
October 29, 2018 10 Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Edgar, Duncan)
October 29, 2018 9 NOTICE of Consent to Notice of Removal by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Attorney Duncan A. Edgar added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft).(Edgar, Duncan)
October 26, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The new case designation is: 18-cv-938-SM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
October 25, 2018 8 OBJECTION to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marie Kelly. Follow up on Reply on 11/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Lown, Bradley)
October 25, 2018 7 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Lown, Bradley)
October 25, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Verified Petition as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage filed by Marie Kelly. Served/Mailed on 10/15/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/5/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lown, Bradley)
October 24, 2018 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2018-cv-00556, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Glass, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion. Follow up on Objection on 11/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of dismissal)(Glass, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 3 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Glass, Andrew)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage shall file a disclosure statement by October 24, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 10/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
October 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(mc)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-938-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court - South, case number 226-2018-cv-00556 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1720413) filed by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Answer Follow Up on 11/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Documents Initiating State Court Proceeding), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #3 Certificate of Service of Removal, #4 Notice of Filing of Removal) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Andrew C. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Duncan A. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Kelly
Represented By: Bradley M. Lown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?