Pratt v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner

Plaintiff: Rebecca Pratt
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Undetermined: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv00966
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner by Rebecca Pratt. Served/Mailed on 10/29/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/31/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Tillinghast, D.)
October 24, 2018 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice in SSA Case)(mc)
October 23, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(mc)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 23, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-966-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 23, 2018 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Rebecca Pratt. Follow up on Objection on 11/6/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tillinghast, D.)
October 23, 2018 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Rebecca Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Tillinghast, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Pratt
Represented By: D. Lance Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?