Dascenzo v. USDA Rural Development

Plaintiff: Deborah Dascenzo
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Agriculture and USDA Rural Development
Case Number: 1:2018cv00967
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to USDA Rural Development per #4 Order Directing Service.(vln)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by USDA Rural Development.(McCormack, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record by USDA Rural Development. (Attachments: #1 Redacted State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael)
October 29, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
October 23, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-967-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan Superior Court, case number 220-2018-CV-00109 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by U.S. Dept. of Agriculture. Answer Follow Up on 11/13/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dascenzo v. USDA Rural Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Agriculture
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDA Rural Development
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dascenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?