Jackson v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner

Plaintiff: Mary Jackson
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv01000
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 3 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner by Mary Jackson. Served/Mailed on 12/3/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Tillinghast, D.)
November 5, 2018 2 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice in SSA Case)(mc)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
October 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1000-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 31, 2018 Initial Filing Fee paid: $ 400 (Credit Card), receipt number 14649017070 by Mary Jackson re: #1 Complaint - New Case. (mc)
October 31, 2018 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Mary Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Tillinghast, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jackson
Represented By: D. Lance Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?