ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. et al v. Stentech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. and ASM Assembly Systems LLC
Defendant: Stentech, Inc. and Blue Ring Stencils, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01002
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.(Chabot, Pierre)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ervery Lambert on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Blue Ring Stencils, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Ervery Lambert added to party Stentech, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lambert, Gary)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Assented to Motion for John F. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that John F. Bennett, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/24/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for John F. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1743691.) filed by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of John F. Bennett, Esquire)(Chabot, Pierre)
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/8/2019. (js)
December 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Reason for Reassignment: Not all parties consent to the assignment of this case to the magistrate judge. The new case designation is: 18-cv-1002-PB. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(kad)
December 6, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. re: #18 Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment, (CORRECTED) (Nieves, Peter)
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Nieves, Peter)
November 29, 2018 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Stentech, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Chabot, Pierre)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 7, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 1/7/2019. (kad)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PATENT CASE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The attached notice contains important information regarding special patent case related events that must be used when filing documents in a patent case. Counsel should print or otherwise save this notice and follow the instructions closely when filing documents in this case.. Patent Case Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/8/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 7, 2019 filed by Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc..(Chabot, Pierre)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. Attorney Pierre A. Chabot added to party Blue Ring Stencils, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pierre A. Chabot added to party Stentech, Inc.(pty:dft).(Chabot, Pierre)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by ASM Assembly Systems LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Nieves, Peter)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Nieves, Peter)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Stentech, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 11/7/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nieves, Peter)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 11/7/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nieves, Peter)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Mark C. Hohnson submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/16/2018. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(mc)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Kyle B. Fleming submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 11/16/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(mc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC. (mc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC, Stentech, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party ASM Assembly Systems LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.(pty:pla).(Lucic, Robert)
October 31, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. and ASM Assembly Systems LLC shall file a disclosure statement by November 13, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 11/13/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties.(mc)
October 31, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1002-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Kyle B. Fleming to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1727742.) filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.. Follow up on Objection on 11/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Nieves, Peter)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Mark C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1727733.) filed by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.. Follow up on Objection on 11/14/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Nieves, Peter)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by ASM Assembly Systems LLC, ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd..(Nieves, Peter)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1727674 filed by ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd., ASM Assembly Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver to Stentech, Inc., #7 Summons - Waiver to Blue Ring Stencils, LLC)(Nieves, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd. et al v. Stentech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASM Assembly Systems Weymouth Ltd.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Nieves
Represented By: Kyle B. Fleming
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASM Assembly Systems LLC
Represented By: Peter Anthony Nieves
Represented By: Kyle B. Fleming
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stentech, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Bennett
Represented By: Gary Ervery Lambert
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ring Stencils, LLC
Represented By: John F. Bennett
Represented By: Gary Ervery Lambert
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?