Snowman v. Vermont Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Laurie-Anne Snowman
Defendant: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01015
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (jbw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case Assented-To by Laurie-Anne Snowman(Waystack, Philip)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/28/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burt, Gary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company.(Burt, Gary)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary M. Burt on behalf of Vermont Mutual Insurance Company Attorney Gary M. Burt added to party Vermont Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Burt, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Civil Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial as to Vermont Mutual Insurance Company filed by Laurie-Anne Snowman. Served/Mailed on 11/20/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/11/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Waystack, Philip)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1015-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1728403 filed by Laurie-Anne Snowman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Waystack, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #3 CORRECTED Summons) (mc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #4 Double Spaced Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowman v. Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie-Anne Snowman
Represented By: Philip R. Waystack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?