Flannery v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Renee Flannery
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation and Getinge AB
Case Number: 1:2018cv01067
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orent, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 12/27/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aytch, Enjolique)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC with jury demand filed by Renee Flannery.(Cross, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
November 20, 2018 MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1067-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1732991 filed by Renee Flannery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cross, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flannery v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getinge AB
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Flannery
Represented By: Andrew J. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?