Dalton v. GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees et al
Plaintiff: James Dalton
Defendant: GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees, GE Pension Plan, General Electric Company and GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan
Case Number: 1:2018cv01076
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay Litigation to Allow Plaintiff to Pursue Administrative Remedies. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Status Report due by 3/27/2019.(js)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - New Case, re: to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan, GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees, GE Pension Plan, General Electric Company(Decker, Byrne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Decker, Byrne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Joint Assented to MOTION to Stay Litigation to Allow Plaintiff to Pursue Administrative Remedies filed by GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan, GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees, GE Pension Plan, General Electric Company.(Decker, Byrne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Byrne J. Decker on behalf of GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan, GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees, GE Pension Plan, General Electric Company Attorney Byrne J. Decker added to party GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan(pty:dft), Attorney Byrne J. Decker added to party GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees(pty:dft), Attorney Byrne J. Decker added to party GE Pension Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Byrne J. Decker added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Decker, Byrne)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons(es) issued electronically as to GE Pension Plan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons(es) and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Erisa Notice, #2 ECF Notice)(vln)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by James Dalton(Deshaies, Cheryl)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(mc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan, GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees, GE Pension Plan, General Electric Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(mc)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1076-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1734221 filed by James Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver for GE Job Income an Security Plan, #2 Summons - Waiver for GE Health Benefits for Production Employees Plan, #3 Summons - Waiver for GE Pension Plan, #4 Summons - Waiver for General Electric Company, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deshaies, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Job Income and Security Plan for Hourly and Certain Non-exempt Salaried Employees
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Pension Plan
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Health Benefits for Production Employees plan
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dalton
Represented By: Cheryl C. Deshaies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?