Griggs v. Infor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thea Griggs
Defendant: Infor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01079
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Thea Griggs. Follow up on Objection on 1/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A- Lent letter to King, #3 Exhibit B- Secretary of State Corporations, #4 Exhibit C- executed waiver of service, #5 Exhibit 1- First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit A- Charge of Discrimination, #7 Exhibit B- EEOC right ot sue)(King, Benjamin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan E. Douglass on behalf of Thea Griggs Attorney Megan E. Douglass added to party Thea Griggs(pty:pla).(Douglass, Megan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Infor, Inc. by Thea Griggs. Served/Mailed on 11/30/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Infor, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1079-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1734946 filed by Thea Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Charge, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Waiver, #5 Notice of Lawsuit)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griggs v. Infor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thea Griggs
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Megan E. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?