Chaleunphong v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al

Petitioner: Viengsamay Chaleunphong
Respondent: Strafford County Sheriff, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director and Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Case Number: 1:2018cv01093
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Stay All Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director.(McCormack, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Viengsamay Chaleunphong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Supervision, #2 Exhibit Release Notification)(Doyle, Kerry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. Follow up on Objection on 12/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of Alan Greenbaum)(McCormack, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond Object/Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case to December 14, 2018. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case to December 14, 2018 filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director.(McCormack, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case to December 7, 2018. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director Served/Mailed on ICE Enforcement, Boston Field Office on 12/1/2018 and U.S. Attorney General on 12/3/2018.(jb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case to December 7, 2018 filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director(pty:res).(McCormack, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 US Marshal Service of Process re: Clerk Service, #3 Order Directing Service served on 11/28/2018, on Christopher Brackett, Superintendent.(jb)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Respondent Strafford County's ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to Order of November 26, 2018 (Date Served 11/29/2018) (Per Local Rule 7.4 statement or motion to be filed within sixty days.) filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. Attorney Thomas P. Velardi added to party Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent(pty:res).Compliance Deadline set for 1/28/2019. (Velardi, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kerry E. Doyle on behalf of Viengsamay Chaleunphong (Doyle, Kerry)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Kerry E. Doyle complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/6/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
November 26, 2018 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies given in hand to US Attorney's Office as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director and given in hand to US Marshal Service as to Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent per #3 Order Directing Service and Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested, as ordered.(cmp)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk and US Marshal to Make Service, as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Kerry E. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1736498.) filed by Viengsamay Chaleunphong. Follow up on Objection on 12/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Abramson, Ronald)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1093-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 26, 2018 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1736289.) filed by Viengsamay Chaleunphong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abramson, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaleunphong v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Represented By: Thomas P. Velardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Viengsamay Chaleunphong
Represented By: Kerry E. Doyle
Represented By: Ronald L. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?