McCarthy v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel McCarthy
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01120
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 2/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 2/6/2019 or Otherwise Plead filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-cv-01137, Rockingham County Superior Court(Decker, Byrne)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to January 7, 2019 re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 1/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Decker, Byrne)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Decker, Byrne)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 7, 2019 filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 ERISA Notice sent to all parties.(mc)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
November 30, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company and Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston shall file a disclosure statement by December 7, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 12/7/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1120-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 ERISA NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2018-cv-01137 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1739830) filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 12/21/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/14/2018. ERISA Administrative Record Due 12/20/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Liberty, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Mass Mutual, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (state court), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Decker, Byrne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCarthy
Represented By: James W. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?