Pro Con, Inc. v. Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC

Plaintiff: Pro Con Incorporated and Pro Con, Inc.
Defendant: Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01138
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint w/Jury Demand as to Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC filed by Pro Con, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 1/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MCSO Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Return Receipt (green card))(Cole, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Chris A. Caseiro and John M. Burke each submit an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/24/2018.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Pro Con, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Cole, Christopher)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(mc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for John M. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1744291.) filed by Pro Con, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 12/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Cole, Christopher)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Chris A. Caseiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1744266.) filed by Pro Con, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 12/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Cole, Christopher)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission for Chris A. Caseiro, Esq. and John M. Burke, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 1/10/2019. (mc)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Pro Con, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Pro Con, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by December 18, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 12/18/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1138-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1743289 filed by Pro Con Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Registration-MA, #2 Exhibit B - State Registration-NH, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Cole, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pro Con, Inc. v. Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Pro-Con Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Con Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Con, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Represented By: Chris A. Caseiro
Represented By: John M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?