Bank of America, N.A. v. Forest et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Marc and Deborah Forest, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary, Deborah Forest and Marc R. Forest
Case Number: 1:2018cv01153
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER mooting #5 Motion to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations. Text of Order: Moot. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Due to Lapse in Appropriations filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McCormack, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Follow up on Reply on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit as to Attorney's fees)(Plummer, Marina)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary. Follow up on Objection on 1/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B-Certificate of Indebtedness)(McCormack, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-cv-01155, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
December 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1153-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) Modified on 12/17/2018 to change judge designation from LM to JL (jb).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-01155 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by US Department of Housing and Urban Development. Answer Follow Up on 1/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Forest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc and Deborah Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Housing and Urban Development, Secretary
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc R. Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Marina Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?