Arista Development, LLC v. Karkos
Plaintiff: Arista Development, LLC
Defendant: Robert A. Karkos
Case Number: 1:2018cv01181
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Deadlines terminated - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 2/19/2019 is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (js)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan Joint Discovery Plan with Certificate of Service filed by Arista Development, LLC. (Gamache, Heather)
February 12, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/13/2019.(js)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Counterclaim re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim with certificate of service by Arista Development, LLC.(Gamache, Heather)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion for Julie P. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Service. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Julie P. Barry, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/7/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #7 Assented to MOTION for Julie P. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Service (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1761920.) filed by Arista Development, LLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Julie P. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Service (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1761920.) filed by Arista Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit of Julie Barry)(Gamache, Heather)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/11/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand Statement of Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with jury demand filed by Robert A. Karkos.(Ramsdell, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D. Ramsdell on behalf of Robert A. Karkos Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Robert A. Karkos(pty:dft).(Ramsdell, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Robert A. Karkos by Arista Development, LLC. Served/Mailed on 12/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gamache, Heather)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Robert A. Karkos. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
December 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1181-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Arista Development, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gamache, Heather)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1747248 filed by Arista Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Summons)(Gamache, Heather) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arista Development, LLC v. Karkos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Development, LLC
Represented By: Heather M. Gamache
Represented By: Julie P. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Karkos
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?