Berardi et al v. Dream House Mortgage Corp et al

Plaintiff: Aldo Berardi and Chrystina Bekier
Defendant: Harmon Law Offices, Commonwealth Auction Associates. Inc., MCM Capital Partners, LLP, Citi Mortgage Inc., Dream House Mortgage Corp, Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R, Northeast Abstract Co., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. and BSI Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv01208
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Addendum/Amended Exhibits to #2 Amended Complaint by Chrystina Bekier, Aldo Berardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Truth, #2 Exhibit A - US Bankruptcy Court Docket 10-12574-JMD, #3 Exhibit B - Deed, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Mortgage Foreclosure Sale, #5 Exhibit D - Letter dated October 14, 2014, #6 Exhibit E - Harmon Law Offices Letter dated November 11, 2014, #7 Exhibit F - BSI Financial Services Letter dated October 1, 2015, #8 Exhibit G - Letter dated October 29, 2015, #9 Exhibit H - Mortgage documents, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Time-Barred Debt, #11 Exhibit K - BSI Financial Services letter dated February 2, 2016, #12 Exhibit L - Letters, #13 Exhibit M - Letter dated August 3, 2016, #14 Exhibit N - Letter dated December 12, 2016, #15 Exhibit O - Letter dated January 1, 2017, #16 Exhibit P - Certificate of Non-Response Notice of Default, #17 Exhibit Q - Mortgage documents)(jb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued in hand as to BSI Financial Services, Citi Mortgage Inc., Commonwealth Auction Associates. Inc., Dream House Mortgage Corp, Harmon Law Offices, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Northeast Abstract Co., Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Citi Mortgage Inc., Commonwealth Auction Associates. Inc., Dream House Mortgage Corp, Harmon Law Offices, MCM Capital Partners, LLP, Northeast Abstract Co., Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., BSI Financial Services filed by Chrystina Bekier, Aldo Berardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses - Waivers)(jb)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1208-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citi Mortgage Inc., Commonwealth Auction Associates. Inc., Dream House Mortgage Corp, Harmon Law Offices, MCM Capital Partners, LLP, Northeast Abstract Co., Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R (Filing fee $400 receipt number 14649017240) filed by Chrystina Bekier, Aldo Berardi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berardi et al v. Dream House Mortgage Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Auction Associates. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Capital Partners, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream House Mortgage Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Abstract Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldo Berardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystina Bekier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?