Evarts v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Us Trustee: US Trustee
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Appellant: Joanne C. Evarts
Trustee: Lawrence P. Sumski
Case Number: 1:2018cv01224
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for to Obtain ECF Login and Password. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password Follow up on Objection on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lml)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE - Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Complete. Parties shall file briefs in accordance with the deadlines established in B.R. 8018. Follow up on Appellant Brief on 2/25/2019.(lml)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS filed for dates of 09/13/2018 re Evidentiary before Judge Bruce A. Harwood, Transcription by: Cascade Hills Transcription, Inc. (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation Part 11, #2 Appellee Designation Part 12, #3 Appellee Designation Part 13, #4 Appellee Designation Part 14, #5 Appellee Designation Part 15) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation Part 6, #2 Appellee Designation Part 7, #3 Appellee Designation Part 8, #4 Appellee Designation Part 9, #5 Appellee Designation Part 10) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation Part 2, #2 Appellee Designation Part 3, #3 Appellee Designation Part 4, #4 Appellee Designation Part 5) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation Part 10, #2 Appellant Designation Part 11, #3 Appellant Designation Part 12, #4 Appellant Designation Part 13) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation Part 5, #2 Appellant Designation Part 6, #3 Appellant Designation Part 7, #4 Appellant Designation Part 8, #5 Appellant Designation Part 9) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record Filed: Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be conventionally sent to the District Court: Hearing Exhibits. The U.S. Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that the bankruptcy record on appeal in complete, including any necessary transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Readiness, #2 Appellant Designation Doc No 139, #3 Appellant Statement of Issues Doc No 140, #4 Docket, #5 Appellant Designation Part 2, #6 Appellant Designation Part 3, #7 Appellant Designation Part 4) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, jel)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Marcus E. Pratt, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 1/28/2019.(ej)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1224-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Bankruptcy Court case number 16-11056-BAH) filed by Joanne C. Evarts.(ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evarts v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: Geraldine L. Karonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Represented By: Marcus Edward Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joanne C. Evarts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Lawrence P. Sumski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?