Loudon, NH, Town of v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Town of Loudon and Loudon, NH, Town of
Defendant: Edgar W. Seeley, United States, Judith A. Johnston, Kenneth R. Bean, Peter DeJager, Concord Hospital and USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv01225
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/18/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA re: #10 Answer to Complaint, (Schifano, Larry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B Quitclaim Deed, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage E-Seeley, #4 Exhibit D NFTL K-Bean, #5 Exhibit E Attachment Concord Hosp, #6 Exhibit F Mortgage P-DeJager, #7 Exhibit G Tax Deed)(Schifano, Larry)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Kenneth R. Bean, Peter DeJager, Judith A. Johnston, Edgar W. Seeley.Affidavit of Service due on 3/1/2019.(ko)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2018-CV-0072, Merrimack County Superior Court(Schifano, Larry)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2018-CV-0072, Merrimack County Superior Court(Schifano, Larry)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants Judith Johnston, Kenneth Bean, Edgar Seeley and Peter DeJager by Loudon, NH, Town of. Served/Mailed on 12/4/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/25/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mayer, Barton)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Assented to MOTION Lift Stay and Extend Time for Responsive Pleading. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION Lift Stay and Extend Time for Responsive Pleading filed by USA.(Schifano, Larry)
January 28, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Concord Hospital. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). Filer shall refile and add to docket text Replaces document no. 4. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/7/2019.(ko)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Concord Hospital.(White, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Text Searchable Answer) (ko).
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Appearance filed by Concord Hospital.(White, Jack) Modified on 1/28/2019 to remove: "ANSWER to Complaint" (ko).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by United States. Follow up on Objection on 1/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Schifano, Larry)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1225-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2018-CV-0072 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by United States. Answer Follow Up on 1/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings & Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schifano, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loudon, NH, Town of v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar W. Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Larry Schifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter DeJager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Hospital
Represented By: Jack S. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Larry Schifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Loudon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loudon, NH, Town of
Represented By: Barton L. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?