Yarrington et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Collecto, Inc., d/b/a EOS CCA, Seth D Romanos, Eugene N Yarrington, III, Eugene N. Yarrington, III and Seth D. Romanos
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co., Navient Corporation, Radius Global Solutions, LLC, Credit Control, LLC and Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Fifth Count of Plaintiffs' Complaint] filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Surreply due by 3/11/2019. (Deane, W.)
February 27, 2019 HEARING NOTICE re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim The court customarily holds oral argument on dispositive motions. Any party that would prefer that the court not hold oral argument should notify the Deputy Clerk. If neither party desires oral argument, the court may decide the motion on the written filings. ORAL ARGUMENT on Motion - Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 25 OBJECTION to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Seth D. Romanos, Eugene N. Yarrington, III. Follow up on Reply on 3/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Kline, Nicholas)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #24 Brief filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1488.(cmp)
February 11, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by JP Morgan Chase & Co.(Deane, W.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party JP Morgan Chase & Co.(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 2/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Deane, W.)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines Answer or Otherwise Plead. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/11/2019. (jb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Lawrence J. Bartel complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/21/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase & Co. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Strauss, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Attorney Michael Strauss added to party JP Morgan Chase & Co.(pty:dft).(Strauss, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Lawrence J. Bartel to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Collecto Inc (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1768738.) filed by Collecto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Applicant Affidavit, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing)(Mattson, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement by Collecto, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mattson, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Collecto, Inc..(Mattson, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Credit Control, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Credit Control, LLC.(Borden, Ryan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to February 6, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/6/2019. (jb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Navient Corporation.(Murphy, Joseph)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-01304, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of State court Record, #2 Part 3 of State Court Record)(O'Donnell, Jordan)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Jordan O'Donnell complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/4/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Radius Global Solutions, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Quarles, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Radius Global Solutions, LLC.(Quarles, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 Partially Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 6, 2019 filed by Collecto, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mattson, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Gardner Mattson on behalf of Collecto, Inc. Attorney Joseph Gardner Mattson added to party Collecto, Inc.(pty:dft).(Mattson, Joseph)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Statemen of Concurrence re: Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission of Jordan S. O'Donnell, Esq. by Navient Corporation(Murphy, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to February 6, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/6/2019. (jb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B.S. Quarles, Jr on behalf of Radius Global Solutions, LLC Attorney Thomas B.S. Quarles, Jr added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft).(Quarles, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Credit Control, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Borden, Ryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to February 6, 2019 filed by Credit Control, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 1/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Borden, Ryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan M. Borden on behalf of Credit Control, LLC Attorney Ryan M. Borden added to party Credit Control, LLC(pty:dft).(Borden, Ryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edmond J. Ford on behalf of Credit Control, LLC Attorney Edmond J. Ford added to party Credit Control, LLC(pty:dft).(Ford, Edmond)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Extend Time to Answer for Defendant Navient Corporation to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/6/2019. (jb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jordan O'Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1757035.) filed by Navient Corporation. Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Jordan O'Donnell)(Murphy, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Navient Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Murphy, Joseph)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Answer for Defendant Navient Corporation to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Navient Corporation. Follow up on Objection on 1/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Murphy, Joseph)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Navient Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Navient Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by January 15, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-15-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 7, 2019 Initial Filing Fee paid: $ 400 (Credit Card), receipt number 0102-1754626 by Navient Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. (bt)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENTS: Navient Corporation submitted two duplicate payments in the amount of $400 each, receipt no. 0102-1754642 and 0102-1754665, re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper.(bt)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by Navient Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 1/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarrington et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Michael Strauss
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Paul Murphy
Represented By: Jordan S. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Thomas B.S. Quarles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control, LLC
Represented By: Edmond J. Ford
Represented By: Ryan M. Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Bartel
Represented By: Joseph Gardner Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collecto, Inc., d/b/a EOS CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth D Romanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene N Yarrington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene N. Yarrington, III
Represented By: Nicholas G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth D. Romanos
Represented By: Nicholas G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?