American Sentinel Insurance Company v. MVJK Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Sentinel Insurance Company
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company, Nicholas Hadley, Abeid Felekini, MVJK Group, Inc. and Christina St. Onge
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Nicholas Hadley by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 2/7/2019.(Pignatelli, Adam)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christina St. Onge by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 2/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pignatelli, Adam)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Great West Casualty Company by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 2/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pignatelli, Adam)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Shindell on behalf of American Sentinel Insurance Company pro hac vice (Shindell, Robert)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek M. Gillis on behalf of American Sentinel Insurance Company (Gillis, Derek)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Robert C. Shindell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert C. Shindell submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/15/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Derek M. Gillis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Derek M. Gillis submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/15/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Robert C. Shindell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1767128.) filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 2/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Pignatelli, Adam)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Derek M. Gillis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1767109.) filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 2/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Pignatelli, Adam)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Abeid Felekini, Great West Casualty Company, Nicholas Hadley, MVJK Group, Inc., Christina St. Onge. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ej)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR. REPLACED BY DN #4 . Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Abeid Felekini, Great West Casualty Company, Nicholas Hadley, MVJK Group, Inc., Christina St. Onge. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Assignment to Magistrate, #2 Notice ECF)(ej) Modified on 1/24/2019 to add: FILED IN ERROR (ej).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by American Sentinel Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Pignatelli, Adam)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. American Sentinel Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by January 30, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ej)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-62-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1759668 filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certified Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Underlying Case Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pignatelli, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #4 Summons, #5 Summons #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #9 Notice of Lawsuit Waiver, #10 Notice of Lawsuit Waiver, #11 Notice of Lawsuit Waiver, #12 Notice of Lawsuit Waiver, #13 Notice of Lawsuit Waiver) (ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Sentinel Insurance Company v. MVJK Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abeid Felekini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVJK Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina St. Onge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sentinel Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam B. Pignatelli
Represented By: Derek M. Gillis
Represented By: Robert C. Shindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?