Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC v. Dover, NH, City of

Plaintiff: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC
Defendant: City of Dover, New Hampshire and Dover, NH, City of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher T. Hilson on behalf of Dover, NH, City of Attorney Christopher T. Hilson added to party Dover, NH, City of(pty:dft).(Hilson, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dover, NH, City of by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC. Served/Mailed on 1/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Grill, Steven)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Grill, Steven)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Industrial Tower and Wirless, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by January 25, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Dover, NH, City of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC(Grill, Steven)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-67-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1759851 filed by Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dover Ordinance, #2 Exhibit B- Application for Variance, #3 Exhibit C- Motion for Rehearing, #4 Exhibit D- Initial Decision, #5 Exhibit E - Amendment to Motion, #6 Exhibit F - Decision on Rehearing, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons - Waiver)(Grill, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC v. Dover, NH, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dover, New Hampshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover, NH, City of
Represented By: Christopher T. Hilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Tower and Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?