Huckins v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Anne Huckins
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America/Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00075
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America by Anne Huckins. Served/Mailed on 2/5/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Roundy, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice)(bt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(bt)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-75-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Anne Huckins (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1760755 filed by Anne Huckins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Roundy, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #4 CORRECTED complaint) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huckins v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Huckins
Represented By: Christopher G. Roundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America/Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?