4M Fruit Distributors, Inc. et al v. JLD, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B.C. Produce, Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc., Coosemans Boston, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Gold Bell, Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., J Bonafede Co., Inc., Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company, Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc. and J. Bonafede Co., Inc.
Defendant: JLD, Inc., Margaret E. Donabedian, Lisa J. Donabedian, Suren J. Donabedian, Jr., Lisa Jean Moulton, Jay Donabedian and Peggy Donabedian
Trustee: Northway Bank, Trustee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00091
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 4/15/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION to Attach With Notice filed by JLD, Inc.. (Meier, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #1 PETITION to Attach With Notice filed by Margaret E. Donabedian. Follow up on Reply on 3/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Meier, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint - New Case,, filed by JLD, Inc..(Meier, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint - New Case,, filed by Margaret E. Donabedian.(Meier, Christopher)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/19/19. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/19/2019. (kad)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/19/19 filed by Margaret E. Donabedian, JLD, Inc..(Meier, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 NOTICE of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay by Lisa J. Donabedian, Suren J. Donabedian, Jr..(Meier, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons,Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Motion to Attach, Proposed Order, Notice of assignement to United States Magistrate Consent form, and Notice of Electronic Filing as to Northway Bank, Trustee Northway Bank filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 2/5/2019. Answer Follow Up on 2/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Proctor, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons,Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Motion to Attach, Proposed Order, Notice of assignement to United States Magistrate Consent form, and Notice of Electronic Filing as to Lisa J. Donabedian, Margaret E. Donabedian, Suren J. Donabedian, Jr., JLD, Inc. on the Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 2/6/2019. Answer Follow Up on 2/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Proctor, Daniel)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/12/2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer/Objection Follow Up on 3/12/2019. (kad)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/12/2019 filed by Lisa J. Donabedian, Margaret E. Donabedian, Suren J. Donabedian, Jr., JLD, Inc.. Attorney Christopher T. Meier added to party Lisa J. Donabedian(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Meier added to party Margaret E. Donabedian(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Meier added to party Suren J. Donabedian, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher T. Meier added to party JLD, Inc.(pty:dft).(Meier, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued electronically as to Northway Bank, Trustee. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (bt)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Andrew M. Osborne submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(bt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company, Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Gold Bell, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., J. Bonafede Co., Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, S. Strock & Co., Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Proctor, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 CORRECTED Disclosure Statement) (bt).
January 28, 2019 NOTICE re #3 Complaint - New Case, filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Eaton & Eustis Company, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc., J. Bonafede Co., Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc., Gold Bell, Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Daniel C. Proctor shall file a disclosure statement by February 4, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 2/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses issued electronically as to Lisa J. Donabedian, Margaret E. Donabedian, Suren J. Donabedian, Jr., JLD, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(bt)
January 28, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties.(bt)
January 28, 2019 Initial Filing Fee paid: $ 400 (Credit Card), receipt number 14649017357 by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company, Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Gold Bell, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., J. Bonafede Co., Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, S. Strock & Co., Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc. re: #3 Complaint - New Case. (bt)
January 24, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-91-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Gold Bell, Inc., J Bonafede Co., Inc., S. Strock & Co., Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., Coosemans Boston, Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Proctor, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #3 CORRECTED complaint) (bt). #4 Summons- Waiver, #5 Summons- Waiver (bt).
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Andrew M. Osborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1762183.) filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company, Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Gold Bell, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., J Bonafede Co., Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, S. Strock & Co., Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(b), #2 Proposed Order)(Proctor, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #3 CORRECTED Prohoc Vice Motion) (bt).
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Attach With Notice filed by 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc., B.C. Produce, Inc., Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC, Coosemans Boston, Inc., Eaton & Eustis Company, Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc., Gold Bell, Inc., Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc., J Bonafede Co., Inc., Lisitano Produce, Inc., Matarazzo Brothers, LLC, S. Strock & Co., Inc., Travers Fruit Company, Inc.. Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party B.C. Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Coosemans Boston, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Eaton & Eustis Company(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Gold Bell, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party J Bonafede Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Lisitano Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Matarazzo Brothers, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party S. Strock & Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C. Proctor added to party Travers Fruit Company, Inc.(pty:pla). Follow up on Objection on 2/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Proctor, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #2 CORRECTED Motion) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc. et al v. JLD, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.C. Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travers Fruit Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coosemans Boston, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Strock & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Tomato & Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Bell, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisitano Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matarazzo Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4M Fruit Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Bonafede Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Fresh Salad Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eaton & Eustis Company
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Stanton Produce Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Bonafede Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Proctor
Represented By: Andrew M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLD, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret E. Donabedian
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa J. Donabedian
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suren J. Donabedian, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jean Moulton
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Donabedian
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Donabedian
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Northway Bank, Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?