Banks v. NH State Prison for Men

Petitioner: James Banks
Respondent: NH State Prison for Men, Warden
Undetermined: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: March 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $5 (Credit Card), receipt number 14649017565 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. New case number is 1:19-cv-103-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Appointment of Counsel filed by James Banks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bt)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution.Compliance Deadline set for 3/29/2019.(bt)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by James Banks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. NH State Prison for Men
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Habeas (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH State Prison for Men, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?