Hernandez Jandres v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director et al

Petitioner: Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent and Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director
Case Number: 1:2019cv00130
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 HEARING NOTICE re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Law Student Appearance Annie Lee and Andres Santamaria Cortes by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NH Supreme Court Certification - Annie Lee, #2 Exhibit 2 - NH Supreme Court Certification - Andres Santamaria Cortes)(Kim, SangYeob)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 SURREPLY to Reply to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Notice of BIA Appeal Packet)(Kim, SangYeob)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Replaces DN 14) filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. Surreply due by 3/18/2019. (Rabuck, Robert)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Replaced by doc. no. #15 - REPLY to Objection to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. Surreply due by 3/18/2019. (Rabuck, Robert) Modified on 3/13/2019 to add replaced text (jb).
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) 1 - Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) 2 - Declaration of Tom Nolan)(Kim, SangYeob)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director(pty:res). Follow up on Objection on 3/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of David Wesling, #3 Exhibit B - Immigration Court Decision)(Rabuck, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 US Marshal Service of Process re: #5 Order Directing Service and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on 2/12/2019 on Christopher Brackett, Superintendent.(jb)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #7 Answer to Habeas Petition, filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). Filer shall refile and add to docket text Replaces document no. 7. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.Compliance Deadline set for 2/19/2019.(jb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres(Holper, Mary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Respondent Strafford County's ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to Order of February 6, 2018 (Date Served 02/14/2019) (Per Local Rule 7.4 statement or motion to be filed within sixty days.) filed by Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent. Attorney Thomas P. Velardi added to party Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent(pty:res).Compliance Deadline set for 4/15/2019. (Velardi, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2019: #1 pdf text searchable document) (jb).
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres(pty:pet).(Klementowicz, Henry)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed - signed return receipt as to Attorney General of the United States - as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. (jb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed - signed return receipt received - as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director. (jb)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Granted on the condition that Mary Holper complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
February 6, 2019 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies delivered in hand to Civil Chief, United States Attorney's Office for the District of New Hampshire. Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to ICE Boston Field Office and ICE Headquarters, Washington, DC and Attorney General of the United States, Washington, DC. Copies to U.S. Marshal as to Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent per #5 Order Directing Service.(jb)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. The clerk to make delivery of the Petition and this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire. Clerk to send certified copies as outlined to ICE Boston Field Office and United States Attorney General. Service upon Strafford County Department of Corrections to be effected by U.S. Marshals Service. Respondents shall file an answer or other response within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Respondents shall provide the court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal or transfer of petitioner out of this court's jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to immediately provide a copy of this order to the District of NH United States Attorney's Office Civil Bureau Chief. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Addendum/ to #3 Partially Assented to MOTION for Mary Holper to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1767950.) by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres. (Kim, SangYeob)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Partially Assented to MOTION for Mary Holper to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1767950.) filed by Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres. Follow up on Objection on 2/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Mary Holper)(Kim, SangYeob)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Janders Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Janders(pty:pet).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Mary Hopler, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 3/7/2019.(ej)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
February 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-130-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(ej)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1767625.) filed by Erick A Hernandez Jandres. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo in Support of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) Petitioner's Declaration, #5 Exhibit (Affidavit) Psych Evaluation, #6 Exhibit (Affidavit) Country Conditions, #7 Exhibit 9/19/18 Notice of Hearing, #8 Exhibit 10/3/18 Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit (Affidavit) Counsel's Affidavit, #10 Exhibit 1/9/19 Notice of Hearing, #11 Exhibit 2/4/19 Notice of Hearing, #12 Exhibit Motion for Decision without Further Testimony, #13 Exhibit I-589 Application, #14 Exhibit ORR Verification Release, #15 Exhibit Hussein v. Strafford County DOC Habeas Order, #16 Exhibit Diaz-Ortiz v. Tompkins, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kim, SangYeob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Jandres v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erick Arnoldo Hernandez Jandres
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Mary Holper
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Represented By: Thomas P. Velardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Boston Field Office Director
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?