MacDonald v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Lisa MacDonald
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Ditech Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Brad Wilder advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 5/2/2019.(vln)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/4/2019. (vln)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 4, 2019 or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association.(Breen, William)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. As the Bankruptcy Court has lifted the automatic stay as to the plaintiffs claim against Ditech for injunctive relief (Count 1), that claim may proceed. See doc. no. 10; doc. no. 11 at 1 n.1. The plaintiffs claim against Ditech for monetary relief (Count 2) remains stayed. The parties are free to request a case management conference to the extent they believe one would be beneficial in advance of the preliminary pretrial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/21/2019. (vln)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 21, 2019 And/Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ditech Financial, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association.(Breen, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Ditech Financial, LLC [AMENDED] & SUGGESTION OF AUTOMATIC STAY by Ditech Financial, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapter 11 Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Limited Stay Modification Order)(Breen, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Ditech Financial, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Breen, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2019-CV-00031, Grafton County Superior Court(Breen, William)
February 25, 2019 FILING DUE: State Court Record DUE BY 2/28/2019. LR 81.1 (c) "Certified Copy of State Court Record. The removing party shall file with the clerks office a certified or attested copy of the state court record within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the notice of removal." (vln)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Breen, William)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER staying case as to Ditech Financial LLC. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to March 1, 2019 or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Ditech Financial LLC and Suggestion of Automatic Stay by Ditech Financial, LLC(Breen, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 1, 2019 or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Breen, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Breen, William)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Ditech Financial, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Federal National Mortgage Association and Ditech Financial, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by February 15, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 2/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ej)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(ej)
February 7, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-138-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grafton Superior Court, case number 215-2019-CV-00031 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1769030) filed by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. Answer Follow Up on 2/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 State Court Initiating Documents, #2 Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Breen, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacDonald v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa MacDonald
Represented By: Brad W. Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William P. Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: William P. Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?