Casey et al v. NH Secretary of State et al
Plaintiff: Maggie Flaherty and Caroline Casey
Defendant: NH Attorney General and NH Secretary of State
Intervenor Plaintiff: Edward Naile
Case Number: 1:2019cv00149
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #11 Motion to Intervene. Text of Order: Denied. While the motion is styled as a motion to intervene (and the plaintiffs have apparently responded to it as such), its prayer for relief does not request intervention (to which Mr. Naile is not entitled under applicable law). Rather, the prayers for relief (see Docs. # 11,14) request declaratory relief and dismissal of the case, both of which the court declines to grant under these circumstances in this procedural posture. The court has read with interest, however, Mr. Nailes submissions in the spirit of amicus-style filings. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #11 MOTION to Intervene as plaintiff filed by Edward Naile. (jb)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to April 29, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 4/29/2019. (jb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 29, 2019 filed by NH Attorney General, NH Secretary of State.(Zoracki, Seth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #11 MOTION to Intervene as plaintiff filed by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. Follow up on Reply on 3/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Klementowicz, Henry)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Julie A. Ebenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Dale E. Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene filed by Edward Naile. Follow up on Objection on 3/20/2019.(jb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Dale E. Ho to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1780178.) filed by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Dale E. Ho)(Klementowicz, Henry)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Julie A. Ebenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1780170.) filed by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Julie A. Ebenstein)(Klementowicz, Henry)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Sakowski on behalf of NH Attorney General, NH Secretary of State Attorney Scott Edward Sakowski added to party NH Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Edward Sakowski added to party NH Secretary of State(pty:dft).(Sakowski, Scott)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) on behalf of NH Attorney General, NH Secretary of State Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Secretary of State(pty:dft).(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Michael Zoracki on behalf of NH Attorney General, NH Secretary of State Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party NH Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party NH Secretary of State(pty:dft).(Zoracki, Seth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Attorney General by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. Served/Mailed on 2/13/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Klementowicz, Henry)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Secretary of State by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. Served/Mailed on 2/13/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Klementowicz, Henry)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Caroline Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Maggie Flaherty(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to NH Attorney General, NH Secretary of State. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
February 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
February 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-149-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1771165 filed by Caroline Casey, Maggie Flaherty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Secretary Gardner, #3 Summons to Attorney General MacDonald(Klementowicz, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey et al v. NH Secretary of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Flaherty
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Casey
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Julie A. Ebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Attorney General
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Secretary of State
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edward Naile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?