Great Northern Insurance Company v. Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 3/20/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 4/3/2020. (vln)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving in part #11 Discovery Plan. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/23/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/26/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 12/13/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 12/2/2019.(vln)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. The Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2019 10:00 am is CANCELLED in light of the proposed joint discovery plan. ORDER to issue. (vln)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition on Motion by Great Northern Insurance Company re #11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a c.(Sherman, John)
April 8, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORM Filed. The parties are directed to file the CONSENT FORM attached doc. no. #3 within 24 hours of this notice. (vln)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Sherman, John)
March 15, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 4/22/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Getman, Naomi)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc..(Getman, Naomi)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naomi L. Getman on behalf of Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc. Attorney Naomi L. Getman added to party Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Getman, Naomi)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather S. Ward on behalf of Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc. Attorney Heather S. Ward added to party Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ward, Heather)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher H. Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc. by Great Northern Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 2/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Christopher H. Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1780760.) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 3/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Christopher H. Boyle)(Sherman, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(ej)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(ej)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-160-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sherman, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1772140 filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sherman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Mountain Water Services Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather S. Ward
Represented By: Naomi L. Getman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Sherman
Represented By: Christopher H. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?