Markel Insurance Company v. Reed et al
Plaintiff: Markel Insurance Company
Defendant: Dennis K. Reed, Erin Tufts, SportsZone Corporation and Benjamin Tufts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00191
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: ] Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 5/24/2019. (vln)
April 19, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No CONSENT FORM Filed. The parties are directed to file the CONSENT FORM attached to doc. no. #2 with 14 days of this notice. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due by 5/3/2019. (vln)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 24, 2019 filed by SportsZone Corporation.(Caron, Ronald)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by SportsZone Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Caron, Ronald)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald J. Caron on behalf of SportsZone Corporation Attorney Ronald J. Caron added to party SportsZone Corporation(pty:dft).(Caron, Ronald)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 Summons issued electronically as to SportsZone Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Markel Insurance Company(Robbins, Anne)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaye Rancourt on behalf of Dennis K. Reed Attorney Jaye Rancourt added to party Dennis K. Reed(pty:dft).(Rancourt, Jaye)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Iacopino on behalf of Dennis K. Reed Attorney Michael J. Iacopino added to party Dennis K. Reed(pty:dft).(Iacopino, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Harvey Nosowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(kad)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Harvey Nosowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1775136.) filed by Markel Insurance Company(Robbins, Anne)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - ACTION REQUIRED - re: #5 MOTION for Harvey Nosowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1775136.) filed by Markel Insurance Company. The affidavit of proposed pro hac vice counsel is not attached as required under LR 83.2. Filer shall file the affidavit using the Other Documents/Affidavit event and link the filing back to originally filed motion. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 3/1/2019.(kad)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Harvey Nosowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1775136.) filed by Markel Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 3/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Robbins, Anne)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Markel Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Robbins, Anne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Dennis K. Reed, SportsZone Corporation, Benjamin Tufts, Erin Tufts. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(bt)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(bt)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-191-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1774903 filed by Markel Insurance Company.(Robbins, Anne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Law Suits and Waivers) (bt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2019: #3 CORRECTED Complaint, #4 CORRECTED Civil Cover Sheet) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel Insurance Company v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel Insurance Company
Represented By: Anne Robbins
Represented By: Harvey Nosowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis K. Reed
Represented By: Jaye Rancourt
Represented By: Michael J. Iacopino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SportsZone Corporation
Represented By: Ronald J. Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?