Keshavjivan Corporation et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel and Niki A. Patel
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 07:2023
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text of Order: Because the government does not oppose plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive relief, the motion is granted without prejudice to the government's right to move for an order vacating the injunction upon further case development or change in circumstances. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by USA. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party USA(pty:dft).(McCormack, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel, Niki A. Patel disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hoppock, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Addendum/ to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel, Niki A. Patel. (Hoppock, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Text of Order: Defendant shall file a response to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction on or before April 4, 2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrew Z. Tapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: ] Granted on the condition that Andrew Z. Tapp submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 4/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel, Niki A. Patel. Follow up on Objection on 4/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hoppock, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Andrew Z. Tapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1792268.) filed by Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel, Niki A. Patel. Follow up on Objection on 4/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit in Support of PHV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hoppock, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph S. Hoppock on behalf of Keshavjivan Corporation, Garvit R. Patel, Niki A. Patel Attorney Joseph S. Hoppock added to party Keshavjivan Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph S. Hoppock added to party Garvit R. Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph S. Hoppock added to party Niki A. Patel(pty:pla).(Hoppock, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Prohibiting Remote Electronic Access. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(bt)
February 27, 2019 Set Deadline: Compliance Deadline set for 3/20/2019 for #3 NOTICE - Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se. (bt)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint filed by Niki A. Patel. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Keshavjivan Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by March 6, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 3/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE - Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se, re: #1 Complaint. Signed by Brier Temple Deputy Clerk.(bt)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to USA. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-197-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14649017484) filed by Niki A. Patel. (Attachments: #1 Personal Identifier Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Supporting Docs)(bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keshavjivan Corporation et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshavjivan Corporation
Represented By: Joseph S. Hoppock
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garvit R. Patel
Represented By: Joseph S. Hoppock
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niki A. Patel
Represented By: Joseph S. Hoppock
Represented By: Andrew Z. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?