Keane v. Northland Tool & Equipment, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Okuma America Corporation, Robert E. Morris Company, LLC, Mr. Nicholaus Keane, Okuma Corporation, Northland Tool & Equipment, Inc. and Nicholaus Keane
Case Number: 1:2019cv00212
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Nicholaus Keane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Green, Jared)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nicholaus Keane. Follow up on Reply on 4/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Green, Jared)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: No pretrial conference will be scheduled until after resolution of the pending Motion to Remand. Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
April 1, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Robert E. Morris Company, LLC. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1623.(de)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert E. Morris Company, LLC. (Carter, Christopher)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert E. Morris Company, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 4/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carter, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholaus Keane. Surreply due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Green, Jared)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Okuma America Corporation. Follow up on Reply on 3/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Wolmuth, Heidi)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Northland Tool & Equipment, Inc..(Forbes, Karyn)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2019-CV-00085, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Wolmuth, Heidi)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Okuma America Corporation disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Wolmuth, Heidi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Okuma America Corporation ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Okuma America Corporation.(Wolmuth, Heidi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholaus Keane. Follow up on Objection on 3/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Green, Jared)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #2 Answer to Complaint filed by Okuma America Corporation. The pleading is not dated and not signed. Filer shall refile with date and electronic signature. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1623.Compliance Deadline set for 3/7/2019.(de)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Okuma America Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Okuma America Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by March 13, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 3/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-212-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Okuma America Corporation.(Wolmuth, Heidi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2019-CV-00085 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1778994) filed by Okuma America Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 3/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/15/2019.(Wolmuth, Heidi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing to State Court) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keane v. Northland Tool & Equipment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okuma America Corporation
Represented By: Heidi R. Wolmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Morris Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Nicholaus Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okuma Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northland Tool & Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholaus Keane
Represented By: Nick E. Abramson
Represented By: Jared R. Green
Represented By: Mark A. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?