MED TRUST Handelsgesm.m.b.H. v. Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC
Plaintiff: MED TRUST Handelsges.m.b.H.
Defendant: Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00220
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Motions due by 5/10/2019. Damages Hearing set for 6/7/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Petition as to Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC filed by MED TRUST Handelsges.m.b.H.. Served/Mailed on 3/18/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cook, Ronald)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC.Affidavit of Service due on 4/29/2019.(vln)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC by MED TRUST Handelsges.m.b.H.. Served/Mailed on 3/18/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabinowitz, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ej)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued electronically as to Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(ej)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 *** ERROR REPLACED BY DOC #5 ***NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ej) Modified on 3/5/2019 to add: *** ERROR REPLACED BY DOC #5 *** (ej).
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-220-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Med Trust Handelsgesm M.B.H. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rabinowitz, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1779945 filed by Med Trust Handelsgesm M.B.H.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Arbitral Award, #2 Exhibit B International Distribution Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabinowitz, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2019: #4 Summons, #5 Text Searchable Complaint) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MED TRUST Handelsgesm.m.b.H. v. Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrinsyk Medical Devices, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MED TRUST Handelsges.m.b.H.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alden Rabinowitz
Represented By: Ronald E. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?