Gonzalez et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joy E. Gonzalez and Ernesto Gonzalez
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. and Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00297
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM re #18 Objection to Motion, in Support of Real Time Resolution Inc's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit), #2 Exhibit)(Lake, Hale)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 7/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Lake, Hale)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Addendum/ to #15 Objection to Motion, Affidavit of Mark McCloskey In Support of Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Servicing Transfer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Power of Attorney, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Loan Modification Offer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Mortgage Foreclosure Sale)(Polansky, Kevin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 Addendum/ to #15 Objection to Motion, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage dated April 22, 2013)(Polansky, Kevin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. Follow up on Reply on 7/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Polansky, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #1 Complaint.Plaintiffs granted leave to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order, pleading additional facts, as set forth in this Order, to state a claim with respect to the fraud and misrepresentation claims denoted as the third and fourth causes of action in their complaint.2. The court will complete its preliminary review in this matter upon receipt of the plaintiffs amended complaint, or the expiration of the time allowed for filing a complaint amendment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(cmp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ernesto Gonzalez, Joy E. Gonzalez. Follow up on Objection on 7/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joy and Ernesto Gonzalez, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, 2.7.07 Note, #4 Exhibit B, USBC Discharge of Joint Debtors, #5 Exhibit C, 6.1.16 Letter, #6 Exhibit D, 1.9.18 SLS Statement, #7 Exhibit E, Formal Dispute of the Debt, #8 Exhibit F, Further Formal Dispute of the Debt, #9 Exhibit G, 2.16.19 SLS Statement....)(cmp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER/ Response to #1 Complaint filed by Ernesto Gonzalez, Joy E. Gonzalez.(cmp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION/RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ernesto Gonzalez, Joy E. Gonzalez. Follow up on Reply on 5/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (cmp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Real Time Resolutions, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lake, Hale)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Real Time Resolution, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Real Time Resolutions, Inc..(Lake, Hale)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hale Yazicioglu Lake on behalf of Real Time Resolutions, Inc. Attorney Hale Yazicioglu Lake added to party Real Time Resolutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Lake, Hale)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. disclosing,, and. (Polansky, Kevin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. Attorney Kevin P. Polansky added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 5/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Polansky, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service/Return of Service Executed as to Real Time Resolutions, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. by Joy E. Gonzalez, Ernesto Gonzalez. Served/Mailed on 4/16/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/7/2019. (jb)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Ernesto Gonzalez; #4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Joy E. Gonzalez. Text of Order: Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (bt)
March 22, 2019 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:19-cv-297-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Joy E. Gonzalez.(bt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted as to Joy E. Gonzalez. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs.Compliance Deadline set for 5/21/2019.(bt)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Ernesto Gonzalez. (bt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Time Resolutions, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. with Jury Demand filed by Joy E. Gonzalez, Ernesto Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Exhibit). (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. Real Time Resolutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy E. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?