Belmont, NH, Town of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Belmont NH and Belmont, NH, Town of
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Christopher Clough, Cardinal Health, Inc., Dr. Mark Weinreb, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Dr. Michael P. Dipre, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Doe Defendants, Walmart, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Michael P. Dipre, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mark Weinreb, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Nancy Torresen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by District Judge Nancy Torresen.(vln)
June 3, 2019 Filing 48 PROCEDURAL NOTICE: Due to recusal of NH judges, case referred to the District of Maine. Original filings shall continue to be filed electronically with the Clerk in New Hampshire in accordance with the district Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants, however, are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. No courtesy filings need to be filed in the District of Maine. NOTICE Signed by Erica Jordan, Deputy Clerk. (ej)
June 3, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Nancy Torresen. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-329-NT. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ej)
June 3, 2019 Filing 47 CONCURRING ORDER re: #45 Designated Case Order Out. Judge Nancy Torresen assigned to preside over this case. So Ordered by Chief District Judge Jon D. Levy. (ej)
June 3, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Surreply due by 6/10/2019. (Glahn, Wilbur)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings in cases 1:19-cv-00328-AJ, 1:19-cv-00329-AJ. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REFERRAL ORDER. All of the judges are recused, case referred to District of Maine. Concurring Order sent. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/20/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ej)
May 24, 2019 Filing 44 SURREPLY to Reply to #26 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL 161_0 2018.03.01 Statement of Interest by USA)(Pandolph, William)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (ej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (ej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (ej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ej)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to File Sur-Reply and Exceed Page Limits. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 38 Partially Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limitations Under Local Rule 7.1(e)(1) filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. Follow up on Objection on 5/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bonsignore, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 37 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Sur-Reply and Exceed Page Limits filed by McKesson Corporation.(Pandolph, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 5/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Glahn, Wilbur)
May 10, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. Surreply due by 5/15/2019. (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 7, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. Follow up on Reply on 5/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bonsignore, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 33 OBJECTION to #26 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. Follow up on Reply on 5/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Pandolph, William)
May 6, 2019 Filing 32 OBJECTION to #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 5/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Glahn, Wilbur)
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 5/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 - Removed and Transferred Cases)(Glahn, Wilbur)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that BRIEN T. OCONNOR submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
April 29, 2019 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1806141.) filed by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Bland, Zachary)
April 29, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D. Pandolph on behalf of McKesson Corporation Attorney William D. Pandolph added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Pandolph, William)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #26 Motion to Remand. Text of Order: Defendants shall respond to the merits of plaintiffs motion to remand (Doc. No. 26) on or before May 6, 2019. Plaintiff may reply on or before May 10, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 OBJECTION to #26 MOTION to Remand (Opposition to Expedited Treatment) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 5/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Glahn, Wilbur)
April 26, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
April 25, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand filed by Belmont, NH, Town of. Follow up on Objection on 5/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/01/2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/1/2019. (kad)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/01/2019 filed by Michael P. Dipre, Mark Weinreb.(Pignatelli, Adam)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion for Donna Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that DONNA WELCH submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
April 19, 2019 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Donna Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1802722.) filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Donna Welch)(Callaghan, Peter)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to [or Otherwise Plead] the later of (1) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by the JPML regarding transfer of this case to the MDL; or (2) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by this Court on a motion to remand, if any such motion is filed filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation.(Kenney, Michele)
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 30 days after the later of: (1) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the JPMLs final decision regarding whether to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL. filed by CVS Health Corporation.(Rosenblatt, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and a merger agreement. (Rosenblatt, Arnold)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Bland, Zachary)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Davis Bland on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC Attorney Zachary Davis Bland added to party Mallinckrodt LLC(pty:dft).(Bland, Zachary)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. Quirk on behalf of Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC Attorney Brian M. Quirk added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian M. Quirk added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft).(Quirk, Brian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Allergan PLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter G. Callaghan on behalf of Allergan PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Callaghan, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hilliard, Russell)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell F. Hilliard on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Hilliard, Russell)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Corporation disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Kenney, Michele)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Deane, W.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 60 days after the date of any ruling denying MDL transfer or ruling on a motion to remand, if such motion is filed filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deane, W.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sutton, Blake)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER MDL No. 1 re: conditional transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. MDL No. 2804. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/3/2019. (bt)
April 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The new case designation is: 19-cv-329-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The case shall be reassigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hawkins, Christopher)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B. Pignatelli on behalf of Michael P. Dipre, Mark Weinreb (Pignatelli, Adam)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Mark Cheffo, Esq.; Charles C. Lifland, Esq.; Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2019. (bt)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by Friday April 5, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 4/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Donna Welch, Esq.; Brien T. O'Connor, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 4/29/2019.(bt)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Joly, Rose)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal (Supplemental) by McKesson Corporation. Attorney Rose Marie Joly added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents)(Joly, Rose)
March 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-329-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Belknap, case number 211-2018-cv-00241 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1792537) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 4/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and All Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Delaney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmont, NH, Town of v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Rose Marie Joly
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Zachary Davis Bland
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mark Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Russell F. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael P. Dipre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Arnold Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Michele E. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Blake M. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Dipre
Represented By: Adam B. Pignatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Brian M. Quirk
Represented By: Donna Welch
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weinreb
Represented By: Adam B. Pignatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Quirk
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Belmont NH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belmont, NH, Town of
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?