Welch v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Al R. Welch
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00377
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to September 7, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to September 7, 2019 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden. Follow up on Objection on 7/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden - US Attorney General.(de)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden Served/Mailed on 5/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth R. Aframe on behalf of FCI Berlin, Warden Attorney Seth R. Aframe added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).(Aframe, Seth)
May 23, 2019 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested and Copies to US Marshal as to FCI Berlin, Warden per #3 Order Directing Service.(de)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service via US Marshals Service and certified mail pursuant to order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
May 20, 2019 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $5 (Check), receipt number 14649017835 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. New case number is 1:19-cv-377-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 6/12/2019. (bt)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (bt)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. filed by Al R. Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Al R. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?