Edwards v. Capital Region Health Care Corp.
Plaintiff: Kathleen Edwards
Defendant: Capital Region Health Care Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00516
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference reset for 7/2/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #8 Proposed Discovery Plan of the parties. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Discovery Plan of the parties filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp.. (Collier, Stacie)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Pretrial Conference reset for 7/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 6/26/2019(jb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp.. Follow up on Objection on 6/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Collier, Stacie)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Discovery Plan due on or before 6/17/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp..(Collier, Stacie)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motionfor Jessica Schachter Jewell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 05/17/2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 5/17/2019. (jb)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2019-cv-00234, Merrimack County Superior Court(Collier, Stacie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 05/17/2019 to answer Complaint filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp..(Collier, Stacie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION for Jessica Schachter Jewell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1813602.) filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of J. Jewell)(Collier, Stacie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Capital Region Health Care Corp. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Collier, Stacie)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Capital Region Health Care Corp. shall file a disclosure statement by May 15, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
May 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-516-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack County Superior court, case number 217-2019-cv-00234 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1811798) filed by Capital Region Health Care Corp.. Answer Follow Up on 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- NHCHR charges, #2 Exhibit B- Removal to State court, #3 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #4 Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collier, Stacie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Capital Region Health Care Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Region Health Care Corp.
Represented By: Stacie Boeniger Collier
Represented By: Jessica Schachter Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Edwards
Represented By: H. Jonathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?