Veazie v. Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2 et al

Plaintiff: Pamela G. Veazie f/k/a Pamela G. Davis and Pamela G. Veazie
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC and Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2
Case Number: 1:2019cv00521
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARINGS- Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/18/2019 are cancelled. (js)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #9 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: All pending motions are denied as moot in light of case settlement. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
June 12, 2019 Attorney Stephanie Bray advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 7/12/2019. (js)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/11/2019.(js)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Continue Hearing and/or Appear by Telephone. Text of Order: Denied as moot. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
June 10, 2019 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Motion Hearing re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to 06/12/2019 filed by Pamela G. Veazie. Follow up on Objection on 6/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bray, Stephanie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Anne Bray on behalf of Pamela G. Veazie Attorney Stephanie Anne Bray added to party Pamela G. Veazie(pty:pla).(Bray, Stephanie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Addendum/ to #6 MOTION to Continue Hearing and/or Appear by Telephone by Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2, Fay Servicing, LLC. (Polansky, Kevin)
May 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #6 MOTION to Continue Hearing and/or Appear by Telephone filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1- No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 6. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 6/3/2019.(js)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Hearing and/or Appear by Telephone filed by Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2, Fay Servicing, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 6/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Polansky, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2, Fay Servicing, LLC. Follow up on Objection on 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Polansky, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2019-cv-00309, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified pleadings)(Polansky, Kevin)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
May 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-521-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Fay Servicing, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Polansky, Kevin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2 disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Polansky, Kevin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Superior Court Southern District, case number 226-2019-CV-00309 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1812607) filed by Fay Servicing, LLC, Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2. Answer Follow Up on 5/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Assessment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polansky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veazie v. Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust 2018-RP2
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela G. Veazie f/k/a Pamela G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela G. Veazie
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Bray
Represented By: Michael Joseph Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?