Halle v. US Department of Agriculture

Plaintiff: Jean Paul Halle
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2019cv00526
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (de)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Case by Jean Paul Halle(Clark, Randall)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/1/2019. (de)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 1, 2019 filed by US Department of Agriculture.(McCormack, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2019-CV-00572, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(McCormack, Michael)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-526-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2019-CV-00572 filed by US Department of Agriculture. Answer Follow Up on 6/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halle v. US Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Paul Halle
Represented By: Randall Baldwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?