Western Surety Company v. Turn Key Lumber, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Defendant: Turn Key Lumber, Inc., Turnkey Lumber, Turnkey Lumber Corporation and Fitzwilliam, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00537
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing re: #4 PETITION to Attach With Notice .Hearing set for 7/30/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Edward Flaws on behalf of Fitzwilliam, LLC, Turn Key Lumber, Inc. Attorney Thomas Edward Flaws added to party Fitzwilliam, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Edward Flaws added to party Turn Key Lumber, Inc.(pty:dft).(Flaws, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Turn Key Lumber, Inc. by Western Surety Company. Served/Mailed on 5/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Loeffler, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Fitzwilliam, LLC by Western Surety Company. Served/Mailed on 5/30/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Loeffler, Eric)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion for Eric H. Loeffler to to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Franklin, Christie)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Western Surety Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Western Surety Company shall file a disclosure statement by March 22, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION to Attach With Notice filed by Western Surety Company. Follow up on Objection on 6/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Franklin, Christie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Fitzwilliam, LLC, Turn Key Lumber, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
May 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-537-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Eric H. Loeffler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1814897.) filed by Western Surety Company. Follow up on Objection on 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit)(Franklin, Christie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1814769 filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- General Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit C- Joint Motion for Consent Order, #4 Exhibit D- Order on Joint Motion, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver, #7 Summons - Waiver)(Franklin, Christie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Surety Company v. Turn Key Lumber, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Lumber, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Edward Flaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnkey Lumber
Represented By: Thomas Edward Flaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnkey Lumber Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Edward Flaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzwilliam, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Edward Flaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Christie Lee Franklin
Represented By: Eric H. Loeffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?