Baker v. Brothers Property Management Corporation
Plaintiff: Bobbie-Sue Baker
Defendant: Mountain View Grand Resort & Spa and Brothers Property Management Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re: #7 Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/31/2019. (lw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 31, 2019 filed by Brothers Property Management Corporation.(Sager, Weston)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brothers Property Management Corporation with jury demand filed by Bobbie-Sue Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - HRC Probable Cause Finding)(Douglass, Megan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Amend #4 State Court Record. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(ko)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Amend #4 State Court Record with First Amended Complaint filed by Bobbie-Sue Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Ex. A, Amended Complaint, #3 Attachment to Exhibit Ex. B, Amended Complaint)(Douglass, Megan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bobbie-Sue Baker by Brothers Property Management Corporation. Served/Mailed on 6/3/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bauer, Charles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 214-2019-CV-00063, Coos County Superior Court(Bauer, Charles)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Brothers Property Management Corporation disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Bauer, Charles)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Brothers Property Management Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Brothers Property Management Corporation shall file a disclosure statement by May 29, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-547-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Weston Robert Sager on behalf of Brothers Property Management Corporation, Mountain View Grand Resort & Spa Attorney Weston Robert Sager added to party Brothers Property Management Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Weston Robert Sager added to party Mountain View Grand Resort & Spa(pty:dft).(Sager, Weston)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coos Superior Court, case number 214-2019-cv-00063 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1817091) filed by Mountain View Grand Resort & Spa, Brothers Property Management Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 6/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit C - May 18, 2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Removal to Coos, #6 Exhibit F - Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauer, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Brothers Property Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain View Grand Resort & Spa
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Represented By: Weston Robert Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Property Management Corporation
Represented By: Charles P. Bauer
Represented By: Weston Robert Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie-Sue Baker
Represented By: Megan E. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?