NHCash.com, LLC et al v. Caines

Plaintiff: Kathy Mello, Way Beyond Rewards, LLC and NHCash.com, LLC
Defendant: Scott Caines
Case Number: 1:2019cv00550
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice as to All Claims by Kathy Mello, NHCash.com, LLC, Way Beyond Rewards, LLC.(Cowan, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Way Beyond Rewards, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Cowan, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by NHCash.com, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Cowan, Peter)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Way Beyond Rewards, LLC, NHCash.com, LLC, Kathy Mello. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. NHCash.com, LLC and Way Beyond Rewards, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by May 29, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Scott Caines. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
May 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-550-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1817526 filed by NHCash.com, LLC, Kathy Mello(Individually), Kathy Mello(as Executor of the Estate of Steven M. Mello), Way Beyond Rewards, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Cowan, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NHCash.com, LLC et al v. Caines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Mello
Represented By: Peter S. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Way Beyond Rewards, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHCash.com, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Caines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?