Hannigan v. The Monarch School of New England

Plaintiff: Gail Hannigan
Defendant: The Monarch School of New England
Case Number: 1:2019cv00565
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/16/2019. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Heather Burns, Lauren Irwin, Brook Shilo) (Defts Atty: Joshua Scott, Daniel Schwarz)(Total Hearing Time: 17 min.) (kad)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion for Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION Telephonic Pretrial Conference filed by The Monarch School of New England.(Scott, K.)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln) Modified on 6/20/2019 to remove Telephonic (de).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. The clerk's office shall reschedule the pretrial conference. Upon joint agreement of the parties, and written notice to the court, the conference may be conducted by telephone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Reschedule Pretrial Conference filed by Gail Hannigan.(Burns, Heather)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Gail Hannigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ESI Production Format)(Burns, Heather)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel P. Schwarz on behalf of The Monarch School of New England Attorney Daniel P. Schwarz added to party The Monarch School of New England(pty:dft).(Schwarz, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/2/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by The Monarch School of New England.(Scott, K.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-cv-200, Strafford County Superior Court(Scott, K.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by The Monarch School of New England disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Scott, K.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo on behalf of Gail Hannigan Attorney Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo added to party Gail Hannigan(pty:pla).(Lovett Shilo, Brooke)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren S. Irwin on behalf of Gail Hannigan Attorney Lauren S. Irwin added to party Gail Hannigan(pty:pla).(Irwin, Lauren)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-565-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2019-cv-00200 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1818997) filed by The Monarch School of New England. Answer Follow Up on 6/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannigan v. The Monarch School of New England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Monarch School of New England
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Represented By: Daniel P. Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Hannigan
Represented By: Lauren S. Irwin
Represented By: Heather M. Burns
Represented By: Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?